Liberty Insurance Corporation v. BSH Home Appliance Corporation

Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Defendant: BSH Home Appliance Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00359
Filed: February 10, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 3/22/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/16/12. (cbssec)
March 29, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/29/12. (cbssec)
February 10, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendan'ts Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, Set/Reset Deadlines: BSH Home Appliance Corporation answer due 3/2/2012. by District Court Judge Richard B. Caschette on 02/01/2012. (dbera, )
February 10, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Admitting Michael J. Hopkins Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Plaintiff Liberty Insurance Corporation. by District Court Judge Richard B. Caschette on 01/25/2012. (dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Liberty Insurance Corporation v. BSH Home Appliance Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Tod Edmund Fitzke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSH Home Appliance Corporation
Represented By: Joel S. Neckers
Represented By: Katherine Crawford Yarger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]