ProCom Supply, LLC v. Langner et al

Defendant: Rueben Green, Fred P Schwartz, Esq, First National Management, LLC, Real Investors LLC, L and M Realty Brokers LLC, Mechel Langner, Barbara Langner, Aharon Mann and First National Group, LLC
Plaintiff: ProCom Supply, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00391
Filed: February 14, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2013 102 Featured Case FOURTH ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/22/2013. (kmtcd)
April 8, 2013 119 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 99 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment as to Defendants Mechel Langner and Barbara Langner only, granting 113 Defendant Mechel Langner's Unopposed Motion to Set Aside the Clerk's Entry of Default and gran ting 114 Defendant Barbara Langner's Unopposed Motion to Set Aside the Clerk's Entry of Default. The Motion for Entry of Default Judgment remains pending as to Defendants Mann, First National Group LLC, L and M Realty Brokers LLC, First National Management LLC and Real Investors LLC. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/8/2013.(klyon, )
May 6, 2013 131 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part 129 Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery. Defendants Mechel Langner and Barbara Langner shall file a response to the motion for jurisdictional discovery on or before 5/3/2013. Plaintiff shall file a reply no later than 5/20/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/6/2013. (klyon, )
May 17, 2013 137 Featured Case ORDER granting 129 Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery. Plaintiff may take up to three depositions and may serve up to a total of fifteen interrogatories, a total of fifteen requests for production of documents, and a total of fifteen requests for admission directed at jurisdictional issues. All written discovery must be served on or before 5/31/2013. Responses to all written discovery from the Langners must be submitted on or before 6/24/2013. All discovery allowed pur suant to this Order must be completed on or before 6/28/2013. Plaintiff's responses to Defendants' 120 , 121 Motions to Dismiss shall be filed on or before 7/8/2013. Defendants' replies, if any, shall be filed on or before 7/22/2013. The Discovery Cut Off Date is extended to 10/30/2013 for all other purposes. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/17/13.(mnfsl, )
July 10, 2013 146 Featured Case ORDER: The documents listed on the Langner Defendants' Privilege Log and submitted to the court for in camera review shall be marked "Confidential" in accordance with this court's Protective Order filed simultaneously hereto. Sub sequent to the documents' appropriate marking, they shall be transmitted to the Plaintiff on or before 7/15/2013. The documents in the form they were submitted to the court for review will be held in a secure manner by the Clerk of Court as conventionally filed material and docketed under restriction level 1 pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/10/2013. (klyon, )
July 10, 2013 147 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/10/2013. (klyon, )
August 24, 2013 164 Featured Case Opinion and ORDER Overruling 163 Objections, Adopting 162 Recommendation, and Denying 99 Motion for Default. The Court having found that it lacks personal jurisdiction over Defendants Mann, First National Group, L&M Realty Brokers, First Nation al Management, and Real Investors, the claims against those Defendants are DISMISSED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2). The caption of this action is AMENDED to remove references to those Defendants. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/24/2013.(klyon, )
March 28, 2012 18 Featured Case SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2012 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/28/2012. (kmtcd)
May 3, 2012 61 Featured Case THIRD ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2012 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/3/2012. (kmtcd)
June 21, 2012 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Motion of Defendant, Fred P. Schwartz, for Relief from Default and for Leave to File his Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Instanter. The Clerk is directed to file Defendant Schwartz's Answer. (Doc. No. 50 -2). The 40 Amended Motion for Entry of Default Against Schwartz is DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/21/2012.(wjcsl, )
February 23, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositio ns from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/23/12. (mskcd)
June 29, 2012 72 Featured Case ORDER that attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $1500 are awarded to Plaintiff re: 70 Motion for Attorney Fees, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/29/12.(sgrim)
July 3, 2012 75 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER re: 61 Order Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/3/2012. (kmtcd)
February 24, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2012 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/24/2012. (kmtcd)
July 17, 2012 83 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/17/12. (msksec, )
October 11, 2012 87 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION declining to adopt 80 Report and Recommendations and denying plaintiff's motions for entry of default judgme nt (# 23 , 24 , 27 , 54 , 37 , 38 , 39 , 40 ). Additionally, the Court DISMISSES the action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, but stays the effect of the dismissal order pending the filing of an amended Complaint. The Plaintiff shall have 14 days to file an amended Complaint, failing which the stay shall lift and the Clerk shall close the case. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/11/2012. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ProCom Supply, LLC v. Langner et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rueben Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred P Schwartz, Esq
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Management, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Investors LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L and M Realty Brokers LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mechel Langner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Langner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aharon Mann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Group, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ProCom Supply, LLC
Represented By: Anthony L. Leffert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]