Cohen v. Zook

Plaintiff: Blake Cohen
Defendant: Molly A. Zook
Counter_claimant: Molly A. Zook
Counter_defendant: Blake Cohen
Case Number: 1:2012cv00420
Filed: February 16, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Amend 12 Scheduling Order: Section 7, paragraph (d)(1) of the Scheduling Order is amended to includes engineering experts rather than a standard-of-care expert in the area of bicycling, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/28/2012.(rpmcd)
February 25, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 4/5/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order original only, delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 3/28/2013, lead counsel present in person, and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/25/2013. (rpmcd )
February 28, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER granting 19 Motion to Vacate Re 18 and reset pretrial conference for May 14, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. in the Conference Room and proposed final pretrial order shall be delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on May 9, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/28/2013.(rpmcd)
March 5, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER granting 21 Motion to Vacate re 18 and 20 and Resetting Pretrial Conference for 5/15/2013 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 5/9/2013, in paper form directly to chambers, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/5/2013.(rpmcd)
May 15, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 8/5/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/15/2013. (rpmcd)
July 19, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/19/2013. (rpmcd)
February 21, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/29/2012 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 22, 2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/21/2012. (rpmcd)
February 22, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER granting 7 Motion to Vacate and resetting Scheduling Conference for 4/17/2012 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed scheduling order in paper form directly to chambers by April 12, 2012, at 4:00 p.m, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/22/2012.(rpmcd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Zook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Cohen
Represented By: Bradley Don Tucker
Represented By: Clifton J. Latiolais, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly A. Zook
Represented By: Deana R. Dagner
Represented By: Joan S. Allgaier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Molly A. Zook
Represented By: Joan S. Allgaier
Represented By: Deana R. Dagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Blake Cohen
Represented By: Clifton J. Latiolais, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Don Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.