Great Northern Insurance Company v. Haselden Construction, LLC et al

Defendant: JER Enterprises, Inc., Haselden Construction, LLC and Western Slope Fire and Safety, Inc.
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00435
Filed: February 17, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/4/2012 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 26, 2012. Lead counsel present in person. Counsel for defendants Western Slope Fire and Safety, Inc., and JER Enterprises, Inc., shall file a disclosure statement pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.4, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/23/2012. (rpmcd)
March 30, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Amend Complaint and the Amended Complaint attached is accepted for filing on the date of this Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/30/2012.(rpmcd)
July 12, 2012 44 Featured Case ORDER for Filing Second Amended Complaint and Denying Request for Extension of Time to Add Parties 38 . ORDERED that the second amended complaint is filed. ORDERED the plaintiffs request for extension of time to add parties is denied by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/12/12.(jjhsl, )
July 12, 2012 46 Featured Case ORDER Amending Scheduling Order 39 . ORDERED that the Scheduling Order entered on May 4, 2012, is amended to delete paragraph No. 10 of the statement of undisputed facts on page 11 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/12/12.(jjhsl, )
August 27, 2012 59 Featured Case ORDER Denying 48 and 51 Motions, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/27/2012.(rpmcd)
October 26, 2012 66 Featured Case ORDER re: 65 Stipulation, For Dismissal of All Claims Against Defendant Western Slope Fire and Safety, Inc. (a Colorado corporation) With Prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/26/2012. (rpmcd )
February 25, 2013 68 Featured Case ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 4/4/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order original only, delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m 3/28/2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/25/2013. (rpmcd)
March 11, 2013 70 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE: all claims against Defendants Haselden Resort Constructors, LLC, and IBP Asset, LLC, re dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/11/2013. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company v. Haselden Construction, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JER Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Sam D. Starritt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haselden Construction, LLC
Represented By: Jeffery Blair Stalder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Slope Fire and Safety, Inc.
Represented By: William K. Rounsborg
Represented By: Christian Shaw Monson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Poynter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]