David A. Bovino, P.C. et al v. MacMillan et al

Plaintiff: David A. Bovino, P.C. and David A. Bovino
Defendant: Patricia A. MacMillan and Christina MacMillan
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00551
Filed: March 1, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pitkin
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 110 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/22/2013.(klyon, )
March 1, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss Andrew C. MacMillan as Plaintiff by District Court Judge James B. Boyd on 01/25/2012. (dbera, )
January 21, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 1/21/2014, taking under advisement 116 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
March 1, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Second Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Verified Motions For Special Admission of Out of State Counsel. by District Court Judge James B. Boyd on 06/30/2011. (dbera, )
February 20, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 129 RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiffs' 113 (public entry Docket No. 116) Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint is denied. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/20/14.(mfiel, )
March 4, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 136 the Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Limited Entry of Appearance for Purpose of Responding to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and for Discovery Sanctions. David L. Lenyo may appear on behalf of Garfield & Hecht, P.C. for the limited purpose of responding to the pending motion to compel in this case. Mr. Lenyo shall file a response by 3/10/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/4/2014. (mehcd)
March 1, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Verified Motions for Special Admission of Out of State Counsel by District Court Judge James B. Boyd on 06/30/2011. (dbera, )
March 20, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/20/14.(jhawk, )
March 1, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Second Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer or Other Response. by District Court Judge James B. Boyd on 06/30/2011. (dbera, )
April 7, 2014 155 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 152 Defendant Patricia MacMillan's Motion for Clarification of the March 21, 2014 Minute Order, or in the Alternative, for Reconsideration of April 4, 2014 Order Requiring Personal Appearance by Patricia A. MacMillan. All pro se parties, counsel representing parties, and counsel who have entered a limited appearance, must appear for the April 7, 2014 Motion Hearing. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/7/2014. (cpear)
April 7, 2014 156 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2014, taking under advisement 131 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and withdrawing Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (cpear) Modified on 4/8/2014 to correct text (cpear).
April 7, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Docket entry 156 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order, taking under advisement 131 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and withdrawing Plaintiffs 9; Motion for Discovery Sanctions, is amended to reflect the correct appearance of co-counsel for Plaintiffs as Gordon (Skip) Netzorg and the correct date of 4/9/2014 for submission of supplemental authority regarding the motion to compel. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (cpear)
March 1, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Special Admission of Out of State Counsel. by District Court Judge James B. Boyd on 07/23/2011. (dbera, )
April 22, 2014 165 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice and as moot 131 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and for Discovery Sanctions, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/22/2014. (cpear)
March 1, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Special Admission of Out of State Counsel. by District Court Judge James B. Boyd on 07/23/2011. (dbera, )
March 1, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Court to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem on Behalf of Andrew MacMillan. by Jonathan Pototsky, County Court Judge on 10/04/2011. (dbera, )
March 1, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Andrew MacMillan, Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Behalf of Andrew MacMillan. by District Court Judge James B. Boyd on 11/10/2011. (dbera, )
April 27, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 29 the Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/27/2012. (mehcd)
April 27, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/27/2012. (mehcd)
September 6, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2012, granting but deferring ruling on 35 the Joint Motion to (1) Determine Whether Any Attorney-Client Privileg e Between the Plaintiffs and Andrew MacMillan has been Waived and (2) Modify Certain Deadlines Contained in the Scheduling Order Dated April 26, 2012. Discovery due by 4/10/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 5/10/2013. Initial expert disclosures due by 1/25/2013. Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 2/22/2013. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 7/8/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
December 17, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 25 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Request for Punitive Damages is converted into a Rule 15 Motion to Amend and granted. The requests for punitive damages in plaintiffs' First, Second, Third, Fourth, and Eighth claims for relief are dismissed without prejudice. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/17/12.(mnfsl, )
January 23, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Joint Motion to Modify Certain Scheduling Order Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/8/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2013. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 11/5/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/23/13.(mnfsl, )
May 22, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 47 the Joint Motion to Modify Certain Scheduling Order Deadlines. Expert disclosures due by 6/24/2013. Rebuttal espert disclosures due by 8/21/2013. Discovery due by 8/22/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/22/2013. (mehcd)
September 26, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 9/26/2013, granting in part and denying in part 73 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Discovery due by 11/22/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2013. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 1/21/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. A separate Order to Show Cause will issue to Defendant Patricia MacMillan. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
September 30, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' 73 MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents is granted as to Defendant Patricia MacMillan and denied without prejudice as to Defendant Christina MacMillan. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/30/13. (mnfsl, )
March 1, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 15(a) by Jonathan Pototsky, County Court Judge on 02/10/2012. (dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: David A. Bovino, P.C. et al v. MacMillan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Bovino, P.C.
Represented By: Tucker K. Trautman
Represented By: Evan Michael Rothstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Bovino
Represented By: Tucker K. Trautman
Represented By: Evan Michael Rothstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. MacMillan
Represented By: David L. Lenyo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina MacMillan
Represented By: Matthew Robert Lasek
Represented By: Roger P. Thomasch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]