Helmer et al v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The

Plaintiff: David Helmer, Felicia Muftic, Michael Muftic, Craig Kania and Oliver Martin
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The
Case Number: 1:2012cv00685
Filed: March 19, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Evidentiary Hearing held on 2/28/2014. ORDERED: 88 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT, written order to issue. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (rbjcd, )
March 21, 2014 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 88 Motion to Certify Class is GRANTED IN PART. Only the Colorado class is certified, and only for the purposes of determining strict liability for design defect. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/21/14.(jdyne, )
May 7, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER re: 129 PETITION for Review of Class Certification Order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(f) filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The. Upon careful consideration of the pleadings, the record, and the materials submitted by the parties, the Petition is denied on 5/7/14. (dbrow, )
July 9, 2014 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 101 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 107 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 109 Motion for Summary Judgment. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/9/14.(jdyne, )
September 8, 2014 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 138 Motion to Provide Notice to Potential Class Members. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/8/14. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Class Action, # 2 Transmittal Letter to Contractors)(jdyne, )
September 9, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 148 Order ORDER granting 138 Motion to Provide Notice to Potential Class Members. The preceding order at ECF No. 148 incorrectly identified the deadline for opting out of the class. The corrected order clarifies that the intent to opt-out must be postmarked (rather than received by) the opt-out deadline. The Notice of Class Action [148-1] and Transmittal Letter to Contractors [148-2] are correct remain unchanged. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/09/2014. (rbjsec. )
December 19, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Trial Preparation Conference held on 12/19/2014. granting in part and denying in part 154 Motion in Limine; granting 155 Motion in Limine; granting 156 Motion in Limine; granting 157 Motion in Limine; granting 158 Motion in Limine; denying 160 Motion to Supplement; denying 162 Motion in Limine; denying 166 Motion in Limine; denying 167 Motion in Limine. Jury instructions reviewed and ruled upon as stated on the record.Court Reporter: Tamara Hoffschildt. (jdyne, )
May 23, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a two-week jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on September 23, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference is set for August 30, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 05/23/2012. (rbjsec. )
July 31, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2012, taking under advisement 24 Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel Perkins Coie, LLP. FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
August 29, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 41 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Goodyear's Supplement to Reply in Support of Motion to Disqualify, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/29/2012. (mehcd)
January 29, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The court APPROVES and ADOPTS the recommendation of the magistrate judge 45 . Defendant's motion to disqualify counsel 24 is GRANTED. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/29/13. (alvsl)
July 11, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER Setting Trial and Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference. This matter has been rescheduled for a three-week jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19t h Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on May 5, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference is set for April 10, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel who will try the case shall attend in person. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/11/13. (alvsl)
March 22, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/22/2012. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helmer et al v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Helmer
Represented By: David L. Black
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Muftic
Represented By: David L. Black
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Muftic
Represented By: David L. Black
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Kania
Represented By: David L. Black
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Martin
Represented By: David L. Black
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The
Represented By: David Matthew Stauss
Represented By: Roger P. Thomasch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]