Jones v. Auto Warehouse, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jacob Jones
Defendant: Auto Warehouse, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00712
Filed: March 21, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
 
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2012 16 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/28/12. (msksec, )
January 29, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER: Trial of this matter is set for two days to a jury on May 6-7, 2013, in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/29/13. (bnbcd, )
April 29, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER: Defendant shall submit proposed jury instructions containing the elements it contends the plaintiff must establish to prove its claims and a more thorough statement of why it asserts the plaintiff's proposed instructions are improper, including citations to specific authority, on or before 12:00 NOON on MAY 2, 2013. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/29/13. (bnbcd, )
May 7, 2013 54 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS (Signed by one attorney only) by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/7/13. (bnbcd, )
May 8, 2013 55 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk and approved by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, re: 53 Jury Trial - Completed. By Clerk on 5/8/13. (mnfsl, )
June 24, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER granting 56 Motion for Attorney Fees. The plaintiff is awarded his reasonable attorneys' fees in the amount of $34,230.40. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/24/13.(bnbcd, )
March 30, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/30/12. (bnbcd, )
May 11, 2012 9 Featured Case ORDER. The 8 email is STRICKEN. The defendant shall cease sending communications directly to my chambers unless otherwise instructed by me. All future applications to the court for relief shall be submitted in the form of a motion in compliance with Rule 7. All papers shall be served on counsel for the plaintiff in accordance with Rule 5, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/11/2012. (wjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jones v. Auto Warehouse, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Jones
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Warehouse, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]