Federal Insurance Company v. Pak All Shipping Corp

Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Pak All Shipping Corp
Case Number: 1:2012cv00961
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2012 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/18/2012. (kmtcd)
October 21, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER stricking 31 Motion in Limine by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/21/13.(jjhsl, )
November 20, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to pay its own attorneys fees and costs. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the four-day jury trial set to commence on Monday, April 21, 2014, and the Final Trial Preparation Conference set Tuesday, April 8, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. are VACATED, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/20/2013. (ervsl, )
April 19, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/19/2012. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. Pak All Shipping Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Poynter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pak All Shipping Corp
Represented By: Zane Richard Moseley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]