Stephan v. Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc.

Plaintiff: Janice K. Stephan
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00989
Filed: April 13, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2012 11 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Motion to Substitute Exhibit to Motion to Compel Arbitration. The correct Exhibit found at Doc. 10-1 is accepted as filed, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/9/2012. (eseam)
September 17, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion to Compel. Defendant shall submit its fee and costs claim on or before 10/12/12. The parties shall submit joint status reports to the Court every 90 days, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/17/12.(lygsl, )
February 25, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 19 Defendant's Application for Attorney Fee Award Pursuant to Court Order of September 17, 2012. Granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Award of Attorney's Fees. The 18 Order is amended so as to deny Defendant's motion to compel arbitration 8 insofar as it requests an award of reasonable attorney's fees, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/25/2013. (eseam)
March 10, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to the 32 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice, this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/10/2014. (eseam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stephan v. Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice K. Stephan
Represented By: Mark C. Overturf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]