Willerding, v. Steger, et al.,

Plaintiff: Kelly Willerding
Defendant: Richard Steger and Heartland Trading Company, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00995
Filed: April 13, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion to Amend the Caption by Judge John L. Kane on 06/04/12.(jjhsl, )
July 30, 2012 21 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Motion to Excuse Defendant Parties Attendance at Settlement Conference Scheduled for August 2, 2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/30/12.(sgrim)
March 27, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER Denying 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge John L. Kane on 3/27/13.(sgrim)
July 9, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING JURY INSTRUCTIONS. The amended Proposed Jury Instructions are due on or by 8/12/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 7/9/13. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Willerding, v. Steger, et al.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Willerding
Represented By: George E. McLaughlin
Represented By: Stephen Jonathan Burg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Steger
Represented By: Andrew James Carafelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Trading Company, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew James Carafelli
Represented By: Miles Milton Dewhirst
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Yoder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]