Sloan v. Ameristar Casinos, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Leanne Sloan
Defendant: Ameristar Casinos, Inc. and Ameristar Casino Black Hawk, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01126
Filed: April 30, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Gilpin
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:215
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/8/2013.(trlee, )
October 28, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held on 10/28/2013 before Judge Raymond P. Moore, granting in part 97 Motion to Lift Stay and granting 98 Motion for Hearing/Conference.Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (rmcd)
November 19, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 108 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Compel and Motion for Additional Sanctions, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/19/13.(sgrim)
December 6, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 1/28/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/6/13. (sgrim)
May 7, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/7/2012. (kmtcd)
March 13, 2014 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 130 Motion for Leave. Defendants shall file an Amended Answer, omitting any and all redlining, no later than March 18, 2014. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/13/2014.(trlee, )
April 21, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 4/21/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and for A Protective Order 127 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
August 1, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/1/12. (msksec, )
September 12, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 24 -1). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/12/2012.(klyon, )
October 3, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Take a Preliminary Deposition of Plaintiff Limited to FLSA Collective Action Issues. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/3/2012.(klyon, )
October 9, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2012, granting 48 Motion for Reconsideration. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (kmtcd)
November 8, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The notice period provided in paragraph one and paragraph three of the Notice of Right to Join Lawsuit shall be "on or after April 30, 2009" and that the period applicable to a non-willful violation for purposes of the Notice of Right to Join Lawsuit shall be "on or after April 30, 2010." By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/8/2012. (kmtcd)
November 9, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/9/2012. (kmtcd)
November 13, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Certify Class by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Join Lawsuit)(kmtcd)
March 18, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion to Stay. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/18/13. (kfinn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sloan v. Ameristar Casinos, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanne Sloan
Represented By: Theresa Lynne Corrada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameristar Casinos, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameristar Casino Black Hawk, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]