Delarosa et al v. Coyote Pumping Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Delarosa and Rosanna Mendoza-Rios
Defendant: Coyote Pumping Services, Inc. and Mine Supply Company, The
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01188
Filed: May 8, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion to Strike New Material from Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Second Motion to Amend Scheduling Order or in the Alternative Motion for Leave to File Surreply, and denying 56 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/23/13.(dkals, )
August 20, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Defendant Coyote Pumping Services, Inc.'s Motion for Application of Colorado Law to Plaintiff Antonio Delarosa's Claims and 46 Request to Supplement Reply Brief on Choice of Law by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/20/13.(dkals, )
February 24, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/24/14.(dkals, )
June 11, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/11/2012. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Delarosa et al v. Coyote Pumping Services, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Delarosa
Represented By: Michelle Dawn LeFlore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosanna Mendoza-Rios
Represented By: Michelle Dawn LeFlore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coyote Pumping Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Supply Company, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]