Bargen v. Sapp Bros Travel Centers, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Thoanchelle Bargen
Defendant: Sapp Bros Travel Centers, Inc., Diana Collins, Ashley M. Bailey, Paula Gaer, Anthony Sena, Dax (I) Nance, Dax Nance and Commerce City Police Department
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01199
Filed: May 8, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2012 32 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 29 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/25/12.(dkals, )
August 1, 2012 38 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Amended Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and accepting 31 Amended Complaint, denying as moot 27 Motion to Dismiss, and resetting Scheduling Conference to 9/18/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/1/12.(dkals, )
October 23, 2012 58 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER; 56 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order 51 is modified to extend the rebuttal expert designation deadline to 11/26/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/23/2012.(klmcd, )
December 28, 2012 65 Featured Case ORDER granting 64 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendants City of Commerce City and Dax Nance. The caption on all subsequent filings shall reflect the removal of these defendants. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/28/12.(dkals, )
January 29, 2013 74 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 72 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, denying as moot 68 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, and setting a Discovery deadline of 2/28/2013, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/29/13.(dkals, )
March 1, 2013 76 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The Plaintiffs Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 75 , it is ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his, her, or its own costs and attorney fees, with the exception that Plaintiff shall be responsible for a $1,000.00 (One Thousand Dollars) fee to Defendants expert, Dr. William Hansen, as set forth in the Stipulation. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/1/2013. (cmacd)
May 23, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/23/12. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (cmacd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bargen v. Sapp Bros Travel Centers, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thoanchelle Bargen
Represented By: Susan Marie Leeder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sapp Bros Travel Centers, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Collins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley M. Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Gaer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Sena
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dax (I) Nance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dax Nance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce City Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]