Stanley v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Darlene Stanley
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01241
Filed: May 11, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/13/12. (msksec, )
May 13, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The 22 Joint Stipulated Motion for Dismissal of All Claims With Prejudice is granted. All claims brought or which could have been brought in this action by Plaintiff against Defendant are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own attorneys fees and costs. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/13/13.(mnfsl, )
May 22, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2012 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/22/2012. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stanley v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Stanley
Represented By: David Patrick Reiter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Dennis Dinkelmeyer
Represented By: Larry S. McClung
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]