Dawson et al v. Litton Loan Servicing, LP et al

Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing, LP and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.
Plaintiff: Janell Dawson and Clinton J. Dawson
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01334
Filed: May 22, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2012 13 Featured Case SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/16/2012. (kmtcd)
March 28, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/28/13.(dkals, )
May 22, 2013 46 Featured Case Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/22/13. ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Compel Discovery 34 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted, and the objections a re overruled, regarding responses to interrogatories 1d, 1e, 1f, 2, and 4 and requests for production of documents 1, 2, 4, and 9. The motion is denied, and the objections are sustained, regarding responses to interrogatories 3, 5, 6, and 7, inclu ding all sub-parts, and requests for production of documents 5, 6, 7, and 8, as stated on record. ORDERED: Defendants shall supplement their discovery responses as ordered by June 5, 2013. ORDERED: Plaintiffs may file a supplement to their Motion for Extension of Time notifying the Court of additional documents received and requesting a revised date to respond to 37 Motion for Summary Judgment, as stated on record. ORDERED: Discovery deadline is revised to July 15, 2013. FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)
June 11, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/11/2012. (kmtcd) Modified on 6/11/2012 to correct hearing date (mnfsl, ).
November 15, 2013 73 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2013 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: The court finds that witness Chris Wyatt is refusing to testify without court order and/or subpoena based upon his perception that to do so would subject him to legal process from Goldman Sachs. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take the Deposition of Witness Chris Wyatt 68 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall serve Mr. Wyatt with a proper Notice of Deposition and a Subpoena to attend a d eposition scheduled for November 26, 2013. Upon receipt of the Notice and Subpoena, the court ORDERS Chris Wyatt to attend the deposition, which may be conducted by telephone or video conferencing, as stated on record. The Court RECOMMENDS that Pla intiffs' Motion to Extend the Time Within Which to File a Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 62) 71 be GRANTED, and that the following deadlines be extended: Deadline for Plaintiffs to file a response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be December 16, 2013; and 2) Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' response shall be January 10, 2014. FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dawson et al v. Litton Loan Servicing, LP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing, LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janell Dawson
Represented By: Blair Kenneth Drazic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton J. Dawson
Represented By: Blair Kenneth Drazic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]