Earsom et al v. Monteiro

Plaintiff: Deryl Earsom, Frances Brown, Deryl (I) Earsom and Frances (I) Brown
Defendant: Luiz Henrique Monteiro
Case Number: 1:2012cv01366
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/12/2013 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on September 5, 2013 and lead counsel present in person. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/25/2013. (rpmcd)
February 21, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR NOTIFICATION : principal of Roberts Levin Rosenberg PC shall notify this Court and opposing counsel on or before February 28, 2014, as to the status of representation of Defendant Monteiro including the withdrawal of former counsel, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/21/2014, motion 19 terminated. (rpmcd )
March 28, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Stay: pending completion of settlement and Probate Court approval, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/28/2014.(jsmit)
June 20, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/20/2014. (jsmit)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earsom et al v. Monteiro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deryl Earsom
Represented By: Stephen Francis McWhirter
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Brown
Represented By: Stephen Francis McWhirter
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deryl (I) Earsom
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Represented By: Stephen Francis McWhirter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances (I) Brown
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Represented By: Stephen Francis McWhirter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luiz Henrique Monteiro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]