Schwitzer v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al

Defendant: Office of Mortgage-Backed Securities, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Government National Mortgage Association
Plaintiff: James J. Schwitzer and Tammy L. Schwitzer
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01367
Filed: May 25, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a three-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on June 3, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference is set for April 22, 2013 at 8:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 08/27/2012. (rbjsec, )
November 16, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 20 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice as premature; 22 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice as premature; 23 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests is GRANTED for good cause shown. Defendants shall have up through and including November 30, 2012 to respond to Plaintiffs discovery requests. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/16/12. (alvsl)
February 19, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion for default to plaintiffs' right of rescission 2 is DENIED. Defendants' motion to dismiss 5 is GRANTED. This case and all claims therein are dismissed without prejudice. Magistrate Judge Watanabe's recommendation 27 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED consistent with this order. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file first amended complaint 29 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion to amend scheduling order 30 is denied as MOOT. Defendants' mot ion for an extension of time to file a response/reply to Magistrate Judge Watanabe's recommendation 31 is GRANTED. Defendants' response was considered in this order. Defendant's motion to stay discovery 32 is denied as MOOT. Def endants' motion for extension of time to file a response/reply to plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an amended complaint 33 is denied as MOOT. Plaintiffs' second motion to amend scheduling order 36 is denied as MOOT. Defendants are awarded costs under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 (d) and DCCOLO.LCivR. 54.1. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/19/13. (alvsl)
May 30, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 05/30/2012. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schwitzer v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Mortgage-Backed Securities
Represented By: Daniel R. Delaney
Represented By: Hannah Bell Ross
Represented By: Stephen D. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Hannah Bell Ross
Represented By: Daniel R. Delaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Bell Ross
Represented By: Daniel R. Delaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Daniel R. Delaney
Represented By: Hannah Bell Ross
Represented By: Stephen D. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Schwitzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy L. Schwitzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]