Rodgers v. Walmart, Inc.

Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Colleen Rodgers
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01377
Filed: May 25, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/23/12. (msksec, )
January 29, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal granting 15 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal withPrejudice of Claims by Plaintiff Against Defendant. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/29/2013.(klyon, )
June 18, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2012 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/18/2012. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rodgers v. Walmart, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Suanne Marie Dell
Represented By: Sarah Smyth O'Brien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Rodgers
Represented By: William Wayne Muhr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]