LaRiviere et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: David LaRiviere and Laura LaRiviere
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01435
Filed: June 1, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/2/12. (cbssec)
July 25, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/3/2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 5/20/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/25/12. (rebsec, )
October 17, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 19 Agreed Motion For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem and Brief in Support Thereof; and 20 Motion For Forthwith Ruling on The Parties' Joint Motion For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem. By 10/24/2012 the parties shall nominate a guardian ad litem who is qualified and willing to serve on behalf of O.L. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/17/12. (kfinn, )
February 6, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re 31 Order. Approved by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/6/13. (kfinn, )
June 4, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 7/25/2012 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/4/12. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaRiviere et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David LaRiviere
Represented By: Ethan Andrew McQuinn
Represented By: Chad Patrick Hemmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura LaRiviere
Represented By: Chad Patrick Hemmat
Represented By: Ethan Andrew McQuinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Kittredge Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.