Wojdacz v. Colorado Springs City Police Department et al.

Defendant: Penrose St. Francis Healthcare, Patrick Miller, Colorado Springs City Police Department, Brian Grady and John Ireland
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wojdacz
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01483
Filed: June 7, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2012 102 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 100 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Strike Defendant Patrick Miller's Amended Motion to Dismiss and For Judgment on the Pleadings, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/14/2012. (mehcd)
January 2, 2013 107 Featured Case ORDER denying 103 Motion to Remove Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty from Presiding Further in the Above Captioned Case Due to Fraud Upon the Court. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/2/13. (kfinn, )
January 2, 2013 108 Featured Case ORDER denying 104 Motion to Strike Defendant Penrose-St. Francis Healthcare's Amended Motion to Dismiss and for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 105 Motion to Strike Defendant Patrick Miller's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/2/13. (kfinn, )
January 9, 2013 114 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part the following motions: 110 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Leave to File Answer to Defendant Patrick Miller's Motion to Dismiss and for Judgment on the Pleadings and 111 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Leave to File Answer to Defendant Penrose St. Francis Healthcare's Motion to Dismiss and for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant Penrose St. Francis Healthcare's Amended Motion to Dis miss and for Judgment on the Pleadings on or before 1/15/2013 and shall file a response to Defendant Patrick Miller's Motion to Dismiss and for Judgment on the Pleadings on or before 1/18/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/9/2013. (mehcd)
January 30, 2013 120 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 119 Opposed Motion For Leave To File Plaintiff's Rebuttal To Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's Rebuttal To Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [119-1] is accepted for filing. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/30/13. (kfinn, )
February 25, 2013 126 Featured Case ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO AND ADOPTING 109 RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The objections contained in plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Leave To File Her Rebuttal to Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [11 9] are OVERRULED. City Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint or Quash Service 23 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendants Colorado Springs City Police Department and Commander Brian Grady are DISMISSED as named parties to this action. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/25/13. (kfinn, )
February 28, 2013 129 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 127 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Take Tape Recorded Depositions of Party Defendant(s) with Stipulation Any Party May Bring Their Own Recorder, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/28/2013. (mehcd)
March 21, 2013 140 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 135 Defendant Gary Norman's Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Stop Interrogatories, and Motion to Stop Deposition, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/21/2013. (mehcd)
March 21, 2013 141 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 137 Defendant Patrick Miller, M.D.'s and Penrose-St. Francis Healthcare's Joint Motion to Stay Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c). Discovery is stayed through and including 4/1/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/21/2013. (mehcd)
April 1, 2013 159 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/1/2013. 145 Motion for Protective Order is denied without prejudice. A stay of proceedings is entered as to D efendant Miller ONLY, pending further order of the Court. Defendant Norman shall submit answers to interrogatories to Plaintiff by 4/8/2013. Defendant Norman shall appear for deposition on 5/8/2013 at 8:30 a.m., at the Court's facility located at 212 North Wahsatch, Colorado Springs, Colorado. The deposition shall not exceed seven (7) hours. Defendant Hudson shall appear for deposition on 5/29/2013 at 8:30 a.m., at the Court's facility located at 212 North Wahsatch, Colorado Springs, Colorado. The deposition shall be completed by12:00 p.m. (noon) that same day. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
April 3, 2013 162 Featured Case ORDER denying 150 Motion to Recuse Federal Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/3/13. (kfinn, )
April 3, 2013 163 Featured Case ORDER denying 151 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Recuse Federal Magistrate [Judge] Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/3/2013. (mehcd)
April 4, 2013 164 Featured Case ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 130 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court; the objections stated in Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Hegarty Recommendations for Defendant Miller and Defendant Penrose Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 149 are OVERRULED; Defendant Penrose-St. Francis Healthcare's Amended Motion To Dismiss and for Judgment on the Pleadings 92 is GRANTED; Defendant Patrick Miller's Amended Motion To Dismiss and for Judgment on the Pleadings 94 is GRANTED; Plaintiff's Third Claim for Relief, as set forth in the Amended Complaint at 30 19 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; plaintiff's First Claim for Relief, as set forth in the Amended Complaint at 30 19 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as against defendants, Patrick Miller and Penrose St.-Francis Healthcare. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/4/13. (kfinn, )
April 5, 2013 165 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 152 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Remove Attorney Michael Watts From This Case and 153 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Remove Attorney Kim Deline From This Case. Order denying 154 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Remove Attorney Eric Lamphere From This Case. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/5/2013.(klyon, )
April 30, 2013 174 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice and striking 172 Defendant Hudson's Verified Response to Motion for Default Judgment and Motion to Dismiss All Counts Against Defendant Cliff Hudson, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/30/2013. (mehcd)
May 3, 2013 175 Featured Case ORDER Adopting 166 Report and Recommendations. 155 Opposed Motion To Vacate All Findings and Judgments is denied. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/3/13.(dkals, )
August 6, 2012 20 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 10 Motion to Dismiss or Quash Service. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is accepted as filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/6/12.(mjgsl, )
September 5, 2013 217 Featured Case ORDER Overruling Objections and Adopting Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The objections contained in Plaintiff's Response to Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 211 ] are OVERRULED. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [#[206 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court. Plaintiff's Opposed Motion To Consolidate Actions [# 203 ] is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/5/2013.(klyon, )
September 5, 2013 218 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 210 Notice to Court for Status Conference and 214 Notice to Court, both contrued by the Court as Motions. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/5/2013.(klyon, )
December 3, 2013 231 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 229 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion For Trial Setting. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/3/2013.(klyon, )
December 13, 2013 233 Featured Case ORDER Sustaining 227 Objection to And Rejecting 226 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge and Granting Defendanting Ireland's 207 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment claim against defendant, Officer John Ireland, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendant, Officer John Ireland, is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption AMENDED accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/13/2013.(klyon, )
February 28, 2014 250 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 249 Motion for Telephone Testimony of Attorney. Mr. Mundt shall participate by telephone for the setting conference 2/28/14 at 1:30 p.m. MST, by calling Judge Blackburn's chambers at (303) 335-2350. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/28/14.(kfinn)
March 3, 2014 252 Featured Case Trial Preparation Conference ORDER. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/24/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. 4 Day Jury Trial set to begin 5/5/2014 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/3/2014. (klyon, )
March 27, 2014 272 Featured Case ORDER Discharging 255 Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff's claims against defendant, Michael J. Duncan, are DISMISSED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/27/2014. (klyon, )
April 1, 2014 275 Featured Case ORDER: Defendant Cliff Hudson's Emergency Motion for Leave To File Motion for Summary Judgment [# 253 ], filed March 13, 2014, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's Opposed Motion To Strike Defendant Cliff Hudson's Emergency Motion for Leave To File Motion for Summary Judgment [# 259 ], filed March 21, 2014, is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's Opposed Motion To Strike [# 267 ], filed March 24, 2014, is GRANTED. Defendant Cliff Hudson's Answer to Amended Complaint FiledAugust 2, 2012 [# 257 ], filed March 18, 2014, is STRICKEN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/1/2014.(klyon, )
April 1, 2014 277 Featured Case ORDER granting 263 Motion to Withdraw. James A. Mundt, Esq., is RELIEVED of any further representation of defendant, Cliff Hudson, in this case. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/1/2014.(klyon, )
April 1, 2014 278 Featured Case ORDER Denying Defendant Gary Norman's 264 Emergency Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/1/2014.(klyon, )
April 7, 2014 285 Featured Case ORDER denying 280 Motion for Leave to File Answer and 281 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Cliff Hudson's Answer to Amended Complaint FiledAugust 2, 2012 [# 279 ] is STRICKEN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/7/2014.(klyon, )
April 14, 2014 287 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 286 Notice to the Court. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/14/2014.(klyon, )
April 15, 2014 289 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 288 Notice to the Court. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/15/2014.(klyon, )
April 24, 2014 292 Featured Case ORDER Approving Juror Questionnaire. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Juror Questionnaire) (klyon, )
April 24, 2014 293 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference held before Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/24/2014. That Defendant Hudson's Notice to the Court [#291] is DENIED; exhibits need to be provided one to another by April 29, 2014; with objections filed by May 2, 2014; proposed voir dire questions must be filed by April 28, 2014. Hearing concluded. Court Reporter: Tracy Weir. (kfinn)
May 1, 2014 302 Featured Case ORDER granting 301 Non-Party Patrick A. Miller, M.D.'s Motion To Quash Subpoena. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/1/2014.(klyon, )
May 5, 2014 309 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 308 Motion for Reconsideration. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/5/2014.(klyon, )
May 5, 2014 310 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot in part and denying in part 307 Notice of Fraud Upon the Court. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/5/2014. (klyon, )
May 7, 2014 314 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Governing the Custody and Disposition of Trial Exhibits, Transcripts, and Papers. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/8/14. (kfinn)
May 16, 2014 317 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiff's notice of Fraud Upon the Court by Robert Blackburn, Gary Norman and Cliff Hudson [# 315 ], filed May 13, 2014, construed as a motion for new trial, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/16/2014.(klyon, )
September 10, 2012 51 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Motion Hearing and Scheduling Conference held on 9/10/2012, deferring ruling on 35 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Trinity Hearing, deny ing 37 Plaintiff's Oppossed (sic) Motion to Produce Home Address of City Defendants, and denying 39 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Vacate Status Report Regarding Proposed Scheduling Order; Scheduling Order; and Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order Due to Fraud Upon the Court by Officers of the Court. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 9/24/2012. Joinder of Parties/Amendment of Pleadings due by 10/25/2012. Discovery due by 6/1/2013., Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2013. Initial expert disclosures due by 4/1/2013. Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 5/1/2013. FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
November 29, 2012 91 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER striking 81 Defendant Penrose St. Francis Healthcare's Motion to Dismiss and for Judgment on the Pleadings, and striking 88 Defendant Patrick Miller's Motion to Dismiss and for Judgment on the Pleadings, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/29/2012. (mehcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wojdacz v. Colorado Springs City Police Department et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penrose St. Francis Healthcare
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Springs City Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Grady
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ireland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wojdacz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]