Lopez, et al., v. Well's Fargo Bank, N.A., et al.,

Plaintiff: Emelda Marie Lopez and Raymond N. Lopez
Defendant: Well's Fargo Bank, N.A, Aronowitz & Meckelberg, LLP, Ortiz and Associates, Inc. and Susan J. Hendrick
Case Number: 1:2012cv01492
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2409
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DOCKET #10 denying 10 Motion for Leave and striking 1 Complaint, with leave to file an amended complaint, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/28/12.(sgrim)
November 19, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 17 Order to Show Cause. It is ordered that the case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) for plaintiffs failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a court order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/19/12. (alvsl)
November 19, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 19 Order. The case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(b) for plaintiffs failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a court order. By Clerk on 11/19/12. (alvsl)
June 12, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. Clerk to randomly reassign this case, by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/12/12. (gmssl, )
June 22, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge re: 7 Suggestion of Recusal. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/22/12.(mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez, et al., v. Well's Fargo Bank, N.A., et al.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emelda Marie Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond N. Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Well's Fargo Bank, N.A
Represented By: Jamie Grant Siler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aronowitz & Meckelberg, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortiz and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Cherami Ball Costigan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan J. Hendrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]