Hanneman et al v. USA

Plaintiff: Craig Hanneman and Kristie Hanneman
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv01501
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/30/12. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
May 8, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Settlement Conference set for 5/22/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Confidential Settlement Statements shall be submitted by 5:00 PM 5/20/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/8/2013. (mjwcd)
May 24, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Settlement Conference set for 6/10/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Deadline for parties to submit Confidential Settlement Statements is 6/6/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/24/2013. (mjwcd)
June 18, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 8/29/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/18/12. (mjgsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanneman et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Hanneman
Represented By: Howard Flicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Hanneman
Represented By: Howard Flicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.