Brooks v. United States Postal Service

Defendant: United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Cindy Brooks
Case Number: 1:2012cv01582
Filed: June 18, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/2/2013 at 02:30 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 28, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/25/2013. (rpmcd )
June 26, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 8/20/2014 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/14/2014 in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m., and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/26/2014. (jsmit)
August 15, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND DEADLINES re 28 and 29 : pretrial conference set for August 20, 2014 and the proposed pretrial order deadline are vacated and, Dismissal Paper due by 8/22/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/15/2014. (jsmit) Modified text on 8/15/2014 (jsmit).
August 20, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE ith prejudice, each part to bear their own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/20/2014. (jsmit)
November 5, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint: the amended complaint [8-2] attached thereto is accepted for filing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/5/2012.(rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. United States Postal Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Brooks
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Gulinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]