First State Bank of Colorado v. Western Hospitality Insurance Group

Plaintiff: First State Bank of Colorado
Defendant: Western Hospitality Insurance Group
Case Number: 1:2012cv01621
Filed: June 21, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/12/2012. (mjwcd)
October 4, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time ; Denying 20 defendant's Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/4/2012.(mjwcd)
January 7, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 18 is amended as to designation of experts, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/7/2013.(mjwcd)
January 31, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Second Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/31/2013.(skl)
April 12, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re: 30 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. This matter is dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall bear their own attorney's fees, expenses, and costs. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/12/13. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First State Bank of Colorado v. Western Hospitality Insurance Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First State Bank of Colorado
Represented By: Douglas Wayne Brown
Represented By: Erick Steven Arriola
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Hospitality Insurance Group
Represented By: Cecelia Alyson Fleischner
Represented By: Daniel Robert McIntyre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]