OrbitCom, Inc. v. Qwest Communications Company, LLC

Petitioner: OrbitCom, Inc.
Respondent: Qwest Communications Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv01639
Filed: June 22, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Dispositive Motions due by 9/14/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/6/12. (cbssec)
March 12, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Respondent's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award 21 is GRANTED and Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award Pursuant to N.Y. C.P.L.R. § 7511 20 is DENIED. This matter is hereby DISMISSED by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/12/13.(jjhsl, )
March 13, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of Respondent, Qwest Communications Company, LLC d/b/a CenturyLink QCC, and against Petitioner, Orbitcom, Inc., on the Courts grant of Respondents Motion to Confirm Arbitration Awar d. ORDERED that Respondent shall have its costs by the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of this Court, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1, within fourteen (14) days of entry of judgment by Clerk on 03/13/13. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OrbitCom, Inc. v. Qwest Communications Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OrbitCom, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Jon Ogborn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Qwest Communications Company, LLC
Represented By: Steven James Perfrement
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]