Coalition for Secular Government v. Gessler

Plaintiff: Coalition for Secular Government
Defendant: Scott Gessler
Case Number: 1:2012cv01708
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/5/12. (sgrim)
September 20, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Joint Submission of Questions for Certification is due on or before September 28, 2012. A trial/hearing date on the merits of Plaintiffs request for a declaration of law and for preliminary and permanent injunctive relief will be RESET upon receipt of the requested guidance from the Colorado Supreme Court by Judge John L. Kane on 09/20/12. (jjhsl, )
October 2, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Certifying Questions Under Fule 21.1, Colo. R. App. P.. re: 33 Notice, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/2/12. (sgrim)
October 10, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. it is formally ORDERED and DECLARED that CSG's expected activity of $3,500 does not require registration or disclosure as an issue committee and the Secretary is ENJOINED from enforcing FCPA disclosure require ments against it. Preliminary injunctive relief is unnecessary and Plaintiff's original and renewed Motions for Injunctive Relief (Docs. 13 , 41 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Plaintiff's request for attorney fees under 42 U.S.C. § 1988 is also GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have to and including October 28, 2014, to submit an affidavit delineating its fees with an expert endorsement of their reasonableness, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/10/2014. (athom, )
October 27, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Final Judgment. ORDERED that Plaintiffs request for attorney fees under 42 U.S.C. § 1988 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have to and including October 28, 2 014 to submit an affidavit delineating its fees with an expert endorsement of their reasonableness by Clerk on 10/27/14. (jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coalition for Secular Government v. Gessler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition for Secular Government
Represented By: Tyler Leandro Martinez
Represented By: Allen Joseph Dickerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Gessler
Represented By: Matthew David Grove
Represented By: Maurice G. Knaizer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]