Meeper, LLC v. Lester et al

Defendant: Joyce L. Lester, Charles C. Powers, Suzy Smith Woodard, David L. Maley and Davis Engineering Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Meeper, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv01732
Filed: July 3, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2012 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/30/2012. (kmtcd)
October 10, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Status Report due by 10/20/2014. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/10/2014. (athom, )
October 26, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2013 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/26/2012. (kmtcd)
February 1, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant David L. Maley is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(1), and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/01/13. (jjhsl, )
March 11, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Dismiss Negligent Misrepresentation Claim. Plaintiff's negligent misrepresentation claim is DISMISSED as to Defendant Charles C. Powers only by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/11/13.(jjhsl, )
April 18, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion to Bifurcate and Stay Claims Against Defendant Charles C. Powers (ECF No. 22) is DENIED by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/18/13.(jjhsl, )
April 25, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Defendant Suzy Smith Woodward. Each party shall pay their respective costs and attorney fees by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/25/13.(jjhsl, )
May 20, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion to Clarify Court's Order Denying Mr. Powerss Motion to Bifurcate and Stay by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/20/13.(jjhsl, )
June 17, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendant Joyce L. Lester With Prejudice and Release of Lis Pendens. ORDERED that the Notice of Lis Pendens recorded at Book 561, Page 1727 on August 23, 2012, in the records of Rio Grande County, Colorado affecting the property described in the Notice of Lis Pendens, attached as Exhibit A to Plaintiffs motion and incorporated herein by reference, is hereby RELEASED by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/17/13.(jjhsl, )
June 24, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 63 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Robert R. Marshall, Jr. is relieved of any further representation, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/24/13.(sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meeper, LLC v. Lester et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce L. Lester
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles C. Powers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzy Smith Woodard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Maley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Engineering Service, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meeper, LLC
Represented By: Trevor G. Bartel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]