Jaeger et al v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Plaintiff: Lawrence E. Jaeger and Amy P. Jaeger
Case Number: 1:2012cv01736
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTINGSCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/26/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/10/12. (Attachments: # 1 1, # 2 2, # 3 3) (mjgsl, )
September 26, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/16/2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Bench Trial set for 8/19/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/26/12. (rebsec, )
September 27, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/16/2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Bench Trial set for 8/19/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/26/12. (rebsec, )
March 14, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/14/2013. (klyon, )
April 19, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: An Evidentiary Hearing on the Motion to DisqualifyKeith A. Gantenbein, Jr. as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs [# 26 ] is SET for 5/22/2013 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom C-204, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Str eet, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall provide to each other and to the Court a list of exhibits each expects to submit and of witnesses each expects to call at the hearing no later than 5/15/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/19/2013. (klyon, )
May 7, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Attorney Keith A. Gantenbein as Co-counsel and denying as moot 26 Motion to Disqualify Keith A. Gantenbein, Jr. as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs. The Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/22/2013 at 1:30 p.m. is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/7/2013. (klyon, )
July 17, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion To Dismiss Action [# 37 ] is GRANTED. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set8/16/2013, are VACATED. The trial to the court set to commence 8/19/2013, is VACATED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/17/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaeger et al v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas W. Carroll
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Represented By: Thomas W. Carroll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence E. Jaeger
Represented By: Gregory John Ortiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy P. Jaeger
Represented By: Gregory John Ortiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]