Sorce v. Ditech et al

Defendant: Mortgage ElectronicRegistration Systems, Inc ("MERS"), GMAC Mortgage, LLC, GMAC Mortgage, Freddie Mac Multi-class Certificates Series 3499 and Ditech
Plaintiff: Marsha Sorce
Case Number: 1:2012cv01958
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re: 11 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Marsha Sorce. Request for extension of time to file amended complaint is GRANTED. Amended Complaint to be filed on or before 9/28/12. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/18/12. (bnbcd, )
June 6, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6) and 9(b) be GRANTED and the complaint be dismissed in its entirety. It is further ORDERED the defendants' request for costs and attorney fees is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/6/13. (bnbcd, )
June 27, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting and Affirming June 6, 2013 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland (Doc. # 28 ) is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED as an Order of this Court. Pursuant to the Recommendation, it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 22 ) is GRANTED, and the case is hereby DISMISSED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/27/13. (alvsl)
June 27, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff Marsha Sorce re: 30 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations. Entered by Clerk on June 27, 2013. (ebutl)
August 6, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 1 Complaint, filed by Marsha Sorce, is STRICKEN for failure to comply with F.R.C.P. 8. Plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint on or before 8/20/12 pursuant to the terms of this order. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/6/12. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorce v. Ditech et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage ElectronicRegistration Systems, Inc ("MERS")
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddie Mac Multi-class Certificates Series 3499
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Sorce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]