Swann v. Sam's Club

Plaintiff: Teresa Swann
Defendant: Sam's Club
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02006
Filed: July 31, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/2/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (ervsl, )
April 24, 2013 30 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw 28 is GRANTED. Accordingly, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Amend 23 is deemed WITHDRAWN, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/24/2013.(ervsl, )
May 30, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. The above-captioned matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay her or its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/31/2013.(ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Swann v. Sam's Club
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Swann
Represented By: Cathy Ann Klein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's Club
Represented By: Suanne Marie Dell
Represented By: Karen R. Wells
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]