Banks v. Arapahoe County Detention Center et al

Defendant: Bendicroft, Gallegos, Arapahoe County Detention Center, Walcher, Erin, Knight, Sheila Clark and Kraus
Plaintiff: Torrey V. Banks
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02014
Filed: August 1, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2012 18 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Time Extension to Cure Deficiencies; granting in part and denying in part 17 Declaration: Motion for Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/17/2012.(skssl, )
November 8, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/08/2012. (skssl, )
November 13, 2012 22 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/13/12 DENYING 21 Motion for Reconsideration re 6 Order on Motion For Appointment of Counsel. Plaintiff continues to have thirty (30) days from the order of November 8, 2012 (ECF No. 20), in which to file an amended complaint as directed. (nmmsl, )
December 10, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Granting Motion for Extention of Time. ORDERED that the portion of the combined motion titled "Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief" 23 is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the portion of the combined motion titled and "Motion for an 'Extension' to Amend Complaint" 23 is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Banks will be allowed thirty (30) days from the date of this order in which to submit an amended complaint, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/10/12.(sgrim, )
December 26, 2012 30 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 27 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting 28 Motion to Show Excusable Neglect, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/26/2012.(sks)
January 11, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER Denying Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Granting Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED that the second motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction 33 is denied. The motion 35 seeking an extension of time in which to file an amended complaint is granted. The motion titled Notice of Appeal 32 which also seeks an extension of time in which to file an amended complaint is denied as moot. Mr. Banks will be allowed thirty (30) days from the date of this order in which to submit an amended complaint that complies with the order of November 8, 2012, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/11/13.(sgrim)
February 6, 2013 40 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 38 Motion Requesting One Free Electric Copy of All Documents Filed Thus Far, and Motion Requesting Proof in Writing of My In Pauperis Status for Automatic Payments to Be Taken Out of My Account Monthly from CDOC, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/06/2013.(skl)
February 22, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the amended Prisoner Complaint 41 and the action are dismissed without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that any pending motions, 42 , are denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/22/13.(sgrim)
February 22, 2013 45 Featured Case JUDGMENT re: 44 Order of Dismissal, by Clerk on 2/22/13. (sgrim)
March 29, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER Denying Motion to Reconsider. ORDERED that the motion to reconsider 53 is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the prisoner's motion and affidavit for leave to proceed on appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 52 is denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/29/13.(sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Banks v. Arapahoe County Detention Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bendicroft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallegos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arapahoe County Detention Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walcher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrey V. Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]