Ali v. Clements et al

Defendant: Christians (I), Bernadette Scott, Timmothy (I) Usry, Michele Wingert, Michele (I) Wingert, Tom Clements, Tom (I) Clements, James Faulk, James (I) Faulk, Timmothy Usry, Christians and Bernadette (I) Scott
Plaintiff: Jahad Ali
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02027
Filed: August 2, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to District Judge and to Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the claims asserted against Defendants Tom Clements, James Faulk, Timmothy Usry, and Iris Christians are dismissed. The clerk of the Court remove the names of Defendants Tom Clements, James Faulk, Timmothy Usry, and Iris Christians as parties to this action. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/6/13. (sgrim)
May 13, 2013 35 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 5/13/2013, denying without prejudice 32 Motion to Stay and denying without prejudice 23 Motion for Order. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (rmcd)
January 2, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER Overruling Objections to and Adopting Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The recommendation contained within the Recommendation and Order of United States Magistrate Judge [# 47 ] is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this c ourt. The objections stated in Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate's Recommendation Pursuant to Fed. R. Civil P. 72(b) and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) [# 49 ] are OVERRULED. Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6 ) [# 29 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 [# 27 ] is DENIED. Plaintiff's claims against defendants, in both their official and individual capacities, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Judgment without prejudice SHALL ENTER. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/2/2014. (klyon, )
January 2, 2014 51 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Bernadette Scott, Bernadette (I) Scott, Michele Wingert, Michele (I) Wingert against Jahad Ali re: 50 Order, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/2/2014. (klyon, )
September 4, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. ORDERED that the clerk of the Court add Tracy Spencer, the alias for Jahad Ali, to the Court's docketing records for this case, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/4/12. (lygsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ali v. Clements et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christians (I)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmothy (I) Usry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Wingert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele (I) Wingert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom (I) Clements
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Faulk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) Faulk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmothy Usry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christians
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette (I) Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jahad Ali
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]