Lee v. Clear Creek County Animal Control Officer Staci McBrayer

Plaintiff: William Lee
Defendant: Clear Creek County Animal Control Officer Staci McBrayer
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02056
Filed: August 6, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Clear Creek
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2012 20 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for In Court Hearing held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/15/2012. Taking under advisement 10 Motion for TRO; Granting 16 Motion to Dismiss Party. Clear Creek County and Clear Creek County Sheriff's Department terminated. ORDERED: Mr. Spear's Oral Motion to Dismiss The State of Colorado is GRANTED. Defendant The State of Colorado terminated. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (lag)
September 4, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 10 Mr. Lees Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/4/2012.(ervsl, )
August 8, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 08/08/2012. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lee v. Clear Creek County Animal Control Officer Staci McBrayer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee
Represented By: Jay Wayne Swearingen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Creek County Animal Control Officer Staci McBrayer
Represented By: Andrew R. McLetchie
Represented By: Timothy Peter Schimberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]