Bain v. United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service

Counter_defendant: Keybank National Association and Marguerite E. Bain
Plaintiff: Marguerite E. Bain
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service
Counter_claimant: United States Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02111
Filed: August 10, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:2409
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/4/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Two (2) day Bench Trial set for 10/7/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/27/12. (rebsec, )
April 26, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/26/2013.(klyon, )
May 20, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 48 ] is APPROVED AND ADOPTED as an order of this court. The United States' Motion for Default Judgment Against Counterclaim Defendant [sic] Keybank National Association [# 30 ], is GRANTED. Default Judgment shall enter. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/20/2013. (klyon, ) Modified on 5/21/2013 to correct spelling error (klyon, ).
May 23, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of United States Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service against Keybank National Association re: 51 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion for Default Judgment, by Clerk on 5/23/2013. (klyon, )
July 8, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 55 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment [# 52 ] is GRANTED. Default judgment SHALL ENTER on behalf of plaintiff, Marguerite E. Bain, against defendants, All Unknown Persons Who Claim Any Interest in the Subject Matter of This Action, on plaintiffs claims implicating those defendants in this lawsuit. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/8/2013. (klyon, )
July 10, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Joint Stipulation and Motion To Dismiss. By 7/30/2013, Marguerite E. Bain SHALL COMPENSATE the United States via check made payable to the "United States Treasury" in the amount of $125,000.00. The counterclaims of the United States against Marguerite E. Bain are DISMISSED, and that the United States is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this lawsuit with each of the affected parties to pay its own attorney fees and costs. The United States is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/10/2013. (klyon, )
August 14, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/14/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (ervsl, )
July 15, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court Decree Quieting Title. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion For Entry of Quiet Title Decree [# 60 ] is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/15/2013.(klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bain v. United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Keybank National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Marguerite E. Bain
Represented By: Michael Christopher Payne
Represented By: Michael Christopher Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marguerite E. Bain
Represented By: Michael Christopher Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Lindsay Laurie Clayton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: United States Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Lindsay Laurie Clayton
Represented By: Lindsay Laurie Clayton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]