Albright v. State of Colorado et al

Defendant: Steve Hartley, State of Colorado and Seventeenth Judicial District, The
Plaintiff: Gregory Dean Albright
Case Number: 1:2012cv02174
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Recuse and Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/26/2012.(sks)
December 28, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Objection. ORDERED that the objection titled Objection to Magistrate [Judge] Denial and Directives" 22 filed pro se on December 13, 2012, by Plaintiff, Gregory Dean Albright, is overruled. FURTHER ORDERED that, if Mr. Albright fails to file an amended pleading as directed within the time allowed, the complaint 12 and the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/28/12. (sgrim)
February 28, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 27 Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis re 24 Notice of Appeal ; denying 29 Motion for Leave to Appeal, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/28/13.(lswsl )
August 20, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/20/2012. (skssl, )
July 26, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, and denying the motions for refund 46 and 50 , by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/26/13. No certificate of appealability will issue. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albright v. State of Colorado et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seventeenth Judicial District, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Dean Albright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]