Brouwer v. USA

Respondent: USA
Petitioner: Carl Harvey Brouwer
Case Number: 1:2012cv02191
Filed: August 17, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 18:0983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 1 Motion to Set Aside, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/22/13.(nmmsl, )
January 23, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 20 Motion to Re-Designate Case, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/23/2013.(skl)
April 30, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Petitioner's Amended Motion to Set Aside Declaration of Forfeiture and Motion for Return of Property. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/30/13.(mnfsl, )
May 31, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 25 Order. By Clerk on 5/31/13. (mnfsl, )
August 28, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/8/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/28/12. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brouwer v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carl Harvey Brouwer
Represented By: Joseph Saint-Veltri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.