Rodriguez v. State of Colorado

Plaintiff: Maya Rodriguez
Defendant: State of Colorado
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02216
Filed: August 20, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re: 10 Order, by Clerk on 10/30/12. (sgrim)
April 26, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reinstating Case. ORDERED that this civil action is reinstated pursuant to the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit filed on April 15, 2013. The case shall be reassigned to the pro se docket, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/26/13. (sgrim)
April 30, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Fourth Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/30/13. (nmmsl, )
June 12, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/12/13. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rodriguez v. State of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maya Rodriguez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]