Cure Land, LLC et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al

Plaintiff: Cure Land, LLC and Cure Land II, LLC
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Tom Vilsack, Farm Service Agency and Juan M. Garcia
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02388
Filed: September 7, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference 11/19/2012 08:30 AM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 12/20/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/30/2012.(mjwcd)
January 10, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan. Adm Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/17/2013. Adm Defendants Brief due by 5/17/2013. Adm Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 6/3/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/10/13. (sgrim)
August 14, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming Agency's Decision to exclude the Target Zone from the Amendment is hereby AFFIRMED. The Clerk shall enter judgment against Plaintiffs and in favor of Defendants. Defendants shall have their costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/14/2014. (evana, )
September 13, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/13/2012. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cure Land, LLC et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cure Land, LLC
Represented By: Jessica E. Yates
Represented By: John Anthony O'Brien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cure Land II, LLC
Represented By: John Anthony O'Brien
Represented By: Jessica E. Yates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Service Agency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan M. Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]