Spire Owners Association, Inc. v. SimplexGrinnell LP et al

Defendant: Spirit Delivery and Distribution Services, Inc. and SimplexGrinnell LP
Cross_claimant: SimplexGrinnell LP
Cross_defendant: Spirit Delivery and Distribution Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Spire Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv02421
Filed: September 12, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/7/2012 at 02:30 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on November 29, 2012, lead counsel present in person and no parties or representatives of parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/26/2012. (rpmcd )
November 6, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/7/2012 at 02:30 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on November 29, 2012, lead counsel present in person and no parties or representatives permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/6/2012. (rpmcd)
January 30, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Cross-Claim Without prejudice, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/30/2013.(rpmcd)
July 1, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR,IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO JOIN A REQUIRED PARTY re 25 : Defendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied and Travelers Indemnity Company be joined as a Plaintiff in this action, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/1/2013.(rpmcd )
August 7, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing With Prejudice re 39 : Spirit Delivery and Distribution Services, Inc., with each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/7/2013. (rpmcd)
August 28, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 46 Motion to Withdraw : The Court finds that, all claims against Defendant Spirit Delivery and Distribution Services, Inc. having been dismissed with prejudice and Hall & Evans LLC's representation concluded, no prejudice or harm will result from granting this Motion to Withdraw. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Hall & Evans, LLC's, and the firm shall be withdrawn from this case, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/28/2013.(rpmcd)
November 12, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/12/2013.(ervsl, )
November 18, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 44 SIMPLEXGRINNELL LP'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DESIGNATE NON-PARTIES AT FAULT PURSUANT TO C.R.S. § 13-21-111.5, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/18/2013.(rpmcd)
November 26, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 61 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Endorse Additional Expert Witness(es): plaintiff has an additional 60 days to complete, and disclose, their expert opinions rebutting the opinions of Wayne Hubbard, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/26/2013.(rpmcd)
December 4, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 63 Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiff's Additional Expert Witness(es): Defendant shall have an additional 30 days to conduct any depositions of additional Plaintiff experts once their opinions have been disclosed, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/4/2013.(rpmcd)
February 10, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 3/21/2014 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/13/2014, in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/10/2014. (rpmcd)
March 28, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/28/2014. (jsmit )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spire Owners Association, Inc. v. SimplexGrinnell LP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit Delivery and Distribution Services, Inc.
Represented By: John T. Osgood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SimplexGrinnell LP
Represented By: Richard G. Sander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: SimplexGrinnell LP
Represented By: Richard G. Sander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Spirit Delivery and Distribution Services, Inc.
Represented By: John T. Osgood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spire Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Buchanan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]