Christenson v. Citimortgage, Inc.

Plaintiff: Eugene Christenson and Sharon Christenson
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv02600
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2601 Real Estate Settlement Procedure Act of 1974 (RESPA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings and to Amend the Scheduling Order, and staying discovery in this matter, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/4/13.(dkals, )
September 18, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting and Affirming in Part and Rejecting in Part 30 Report and Recommendations by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/18/13.(dkals, )
September 16, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs' CCPA claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the claim rel ated to Colorado Revised Statute § 38-40-103 is DENIED. Should Plaintiffs wish to file an Amended Complaint with respect to the CCPA claim, an Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than 10/7/2014. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/16/2014. (athom, )
October 9, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/14/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/9/12. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christenson v. Citimortgage, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Christenson
Represented By: Blair Kenneth Drazic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Christenson
Represented By: Blair Kenneth Drazic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick H. Pugh
Represented By: David Matthew Stauss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]