Stewart et al v. Board of Trustees for Colorado School for Deaf and Blind et al

Defendant: Louis Tutt, Louis (I) Tutt, Colorado School for the Deaf and Blind and Board of Trustees for Colorado School for Deaf and Blind
Plaintiff: BPS, Katrina L Stewart and John P Stewart
Case Number: 1:2012cv02664
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 83 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; granting 113 Motion to Withdraw Document as oultined in the attached document. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/26/2013.(trlee, )
January 10, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Trial Preparation Conference scheduled for March 7, 2014, and the four-day jury trial scheduled for April 14, 2014 are VACATED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that when the parties are ready to reschedule these dates, they shall contact Judge Moore's Chambers at 303-335-2784. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/10/2014. (trlee, )
January 17, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/17/2014.Court DENIES IN PART 103 Motion to Quash; HOLDS IN ABEYANCE 107 Motion to Quash; FTR: KLM Courtroom C204. (lag) Modified on 1/17/2014 to add language that the motion was denied "in part"(lag).
March 31, 2014 181 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 169 Motion for Leave File Supplement to Plaintiffs' Replies in Support of Their Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/31/2014.(trlee, )
May 21, 2014 190 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/21/14 Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline for Limited Purpose of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition 188 . The discovery deadline is extended to August 1, 2014 for the sole purpose of taking the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Defendant Colorado School for the Deaf and Blind. (lgale)
June 2, 2014 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/2/14. Motion to Quash Subpoena to Produce [#195] is DENIED without prejudice.(lgale)
July 29, 2014 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Quash, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/29/2014.(trlee, )
July 29, 2014 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Quash, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/29/2014.(trlee, )
March 15, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a five-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on April 14, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for March 7, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/15/2013. (rbjsec. )
July 1, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 62 parties' Stipulated Motion for Issuance of Protective Order. It is further ORDERED: The Protective Order [#62-1] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/01/2013.(klmcd)
July 1, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/01/2013. (klmcd)
July 23, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 66 Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order for Cause. The Scheduling Order entered on March 14, 2013 (# 46 ) is amended to extend the following deadlines: Affirmative Expert Disclosure Deadline August 30, 2013; Deadli ne to Amend Pleadings and Join Parties September 13, 2013; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline September 27, 2013; Discovery Deadline October 11, 2013; Dispositive Motions Deadline December 13, 2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/23/13. (alvsl)
September 26, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Defendant Louis Tutt's Motion for Protective Order and Renewed Motion to Stay All Discovery Proceedings Pending Adoption of Magistrate Judge's Recommendation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion (# 73 ) is GRANTED in part. A ccordingly, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is STAYED in part, as follows: All discovery as to Defendant Tutt is stayed until further order of the Court. All other relief requested in the Motion (# 73 ) is denied. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/26/13. (alvsl)
October 1, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, the Motion is granted in part and denied in part as to Interrogatory Nos. 2 and 4 and granted as to Request for Production No. 9. Defendant School Board shall produce the requested information and documents on or before October 10, 2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/01/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment) (alvsl)
October 12, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/12/2012. (rbjsec )
October 11, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part 90 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. granting 92 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Affirmative Expert Disclosure Deadline November 1, 2013, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline December 1, 2013, Discovery Deadline December 31, 2013, Dispositive Motions Deadline January 14, 2014. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/11/2013.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart et al v. Board of Trustees for Colorado School for Deaf and Blind et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Tutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis (I) Tutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado School for the Deaf and Blind
Represented By: Amy Christine Colony
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees for Colorado School for Deaf and Blind
Represented By: Amy Christine Colony
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BPS
Represented By: Stephen Allen Brunette
Represented By: Kristopher Craig Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina L Stewart
Represented By: Kristopher Craig Miller
Represented By: Stephen Allen Brunette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P Stewart
Represented By: Kristopher Craig Miller
Represented By: Stephen Allen Brunette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]