Garcia v. Graves, et al

Plaintiff: Tina Garcia
Defendant: Judy D. Graves and Elizabeth H. Enenbach
Case Number: 1:2012cv02718
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/21/2012.(ervsl, )
April 2, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Discovery Requests from Defendant Enenbach, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/2/2013.(ervsl, )
April 24, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 21 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint ECF No. 19 is GRANTED, ECF No. [19-1] is ACCEPTED as filed as the operative pleading in this action, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/24/2013.(ervsl, )
August 21, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Defendant's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order; Deadline to Serve Written Discovery Requests November 12, 2013; Defendants Affirmative Expert Disclosure Deadline December 3, 2013; Discovery Deadline December 16, 2013; Dispositive Motions Deadline January 16, 2013, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/21/2013.(ervsl, )
August 21, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot 18 Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. By September 6, 2013, the Parties are DIRECTED to provide a Joint Status Report indicating (a) whether Plaintiff has obtained legal counsel, (b) what steps (if any) the Par ties have taken towards settlement, and (c) whether the Parties have considered requesting a settlement conference pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6(A) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. If in the Parties view a settlement conference before Judge Mix would be beneficial, they should indicate as much in the Status Report, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/21/2013.(ervsl, )
October 2, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 32 Plaintiffs Request the Appointment of Dr. Karin Huffer as Communications Specialist, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/2/2013.(ervsl, )
December 2, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Defendants Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Pending Ruling on Order and Recommendation. Discovery due by 2/17/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/2/2013.(ervsl, )
December 18, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 51 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Defendants Motion for Sanction of Dismissal ECF No. 47 is GRANTED, the Courts Order to Show Cause ECF No. 50 is made absolute, and the above captioned-matter i s hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); Defendants Motion for Imposition of Fees and Costs ECF No. 47 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR. 54.3; and Defendants Motion to Compel Discovery ECF No. 34 , as well as Plaintiffs Motion to Stay ECF No. 38 , are DENIED as MOOT. The Clerk shall enter Judgment in favor of Defendant, who shall have her costs. by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/18/2013.(ervsl, )
October 17, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Graves, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Garcia
Represented By: Joseph M. Elio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy D. Graves
Represented By: Marilyn S. Chappell
Represented By: Sheryl Lynn Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth H. Enenbach
Represented By: Marilyn S. Chappell
Represented By: Sheryl Lynn Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]