Newman et al v. Harlan et al

Plaintiff: Nancy Newman and John Newman
Defendant: Michael D. Harlan and JL Smith Trucking Company
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02797
Filed: October 22, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 100 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Nancy Newman's Claims with Prejudice. The claims of plaintiff, Nancy Newman as an individual, against defendants, Michael D. Harlan and J. L. Smith Trucking Co, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/11/2014. (alowe)
October 22, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Their Answer(s) and / or Other Responsive Pleadings, Including Notice of Removal by Judge Mark Thompson on 08/28/2012. (dbera, )
October 22, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Converting Case Under Chapter 11 to Case Under Chapter 7 by Honorable Scott W. Dales, United States Bankruptcy Judge on 03/17/2011. (dbera, )
October 22, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Newman's August 29, 2012 Motion - Relief from Stay. by Honorable Jeffrey R. Hughes, United States Bankruptcy Judge on 09/24/2012. (dbera, )
November 2, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/2/2012. (kmtcd)
January 16, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/3/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 1/10/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 2/3/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/16/13. (rebsec, )
September 30, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 9/30/2013. ORDERED: 36 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth more fully duri ng the hearing. ORDERED: 51 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth more fully during the hearing. ORDERED: 45 Defendants' Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The court RECOMMENDS District Judge Blackburn adopt extended discovery deadlines and vacate the currently scheduled trial to be reset on a date convenient to the District Judge's calendar no sooner than August 2014. ORDERED: Pending r uling by Judge Blackburn on the recommendation of this court, only the following revised deadlines shall be applicable: The expert rebuttal deadline is extended to November 7, 2013. The discovery cut-off deadline is extended to November 15, 2013. ORDERED: Defense counsel's oral Motion to Reopen the Depositions of Plaintiffs is DENIED with leave to renew the motion if new information is found in the records which Defendants believe justifies reopening of the depositions. FTR: Courtroom C201 - C. Covington. (ccovi) Modified on 10/1/2013 to correct typo. (ccovi)
October 28, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 65 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The pretrial deadlines set forth in the recommendation are approved and adopted as an order of this court. On 11/6/2013, commencing at 10:00 a.m., the court SHALLCONDUCT a telephonic setting conference to reset the Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference and jury trial in this matter. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/28/2013.(klyon, )
October 29, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 66 ORDER Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 65 ] entered 9/30/2013 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court. The pretrial deadlines in the recommendat ion are APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set 1/10/2014, are VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 2/3/2014, is VACATED. On 11/6/2013, commencing at 10:00 a.m. (MST), the court SHALL CONDUCT a telephonic setting conference to reset the Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference and jury trial in this matter. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/29/2013. (klyon, )
November 6, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 7/25/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 8/11/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/6/13. (rebsec, ) Modified on 11/6/2013 to create linkage to 70 Minute Order (klyon, ).
August 25, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 92 Motion for Court Approval of Settlement as to Plaintiff Nancy Newman, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/25/2014.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Newman et al v. Harlan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Newman
Represented By: Robert Dean Wilhite, III
Represented By: Sandra Lynn Hagen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Newman
Represented By: Sandra Lynn Hagen
Represented By: Robert Dean Wilhite, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Harlan
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn White
Represented By: Craig William Cain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JL Smith Trucking Company
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn White
Represented By: Craig William Cain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]