Colorado Mills, LLC v. SunOpta Grains and Food, Inc. et al

Defendant: John Ruelle and SunOpta Grains and Food, Inc.
Plaintiff: Colorado Mills, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv02867
Filed: October 30, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Prowers
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/28/13.(jjhsl, )
July 18, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Each of the affected parties to pay its own attorney fees and costs by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/18/13. (jjhsl, )
October 31, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference; Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/31/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (klmcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Mills, LLC v. SunOpta Grains and Food, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ruelle
Represented By: David H. Goldberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunOpta Grains and Food, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Goldberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Mills, LLC
Represented By: Jordan D. Factor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]