Haefele v. United States of America et al

Defendant: DTG Operations, Inc., United States of America and Timothy J. Shearon
Plaintiff: Debra A. Haefele
Case Number: 1:2012cv02904
Filed: November 2, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: this civil action is dismissed as to DTG Operations, Inc., by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/24/2013. (rpmcd)
January 28, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/28/2013 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on February 28, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/28/2013. (rpmcd )
May 31, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE each party to pay their own costs and attorneys' fees, re 22 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/31/2013. (rpmcd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haefele v. United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTG Operations, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Shearon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra A. Haefele
Represented By: James Lovett Finegan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]