Simpson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Kenneth C. Simpson
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02923
Filed: November 6, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Delta
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2012 24 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 18 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Brief, and denying as moot 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter [21-1] Plaintiff's First Amended Verified Complaint as filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/19/2012. (mehcd)
February 7, 2013 39 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 28 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Supporting Memorandum Brief, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/7/2013. (mehcd)
November 7, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER of Recusal: This matter is before the Court sua sponte. I have a financial interest in Defendant Wells Fargo Bank National Association, through ownership of shares in three mutual funds owned by a securities affiliate of said named Defendant. A ccordingly, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §455(b)(4) and the Code of Conduct for United States Judges, my recusal in this matter is obligatory. Accordingly, I hereby RECUSE myself from presiding over this matter. The Clerk shall randomly reassign this case to another District Judge of this Court, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/7/2012. (ervsl, )
November 8, 2012 9 Featured Case ORDER of Recusal: the Clerk of Court shall reassign this civil action, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/8/2012. (rpmcd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Simpson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Nadia G. Malik
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth C. Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]