Maxfield, v. Bressler, et al.

Plaintiff: Delbert E. Maxfield
Defendant: Weld County, Dave Bressler and Dave (I) Bressler
Case Number: 1:2012cv02970
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2013. 11 Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Qualified Immunity Determination is GRANTED. Scheduling Conference is VACATED. FTR: BNB Courtroom A401. (bnbcd, )
January 30, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 11 Motion to Stay is GRANTED. Discovery and pretrial disclosures are STAYED pending further order of thecourt. The parties shall file a status report within ten days of any ruling on the defendants' Motion to Dismiss 9 . by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/30/12. (bnbcd, )
June 12, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Defendants Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) is GRANTED; All of Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; The stay of discovery and pretrial disclosures ECF No. 19 is hereby LIFTED; and Plaintiff is GRANTE D LEAVE to file an Amended Complaint on or before July 5, 2013. If no Amended Complaint is filed by that date, the Court will close this action, enter final judgment in favor of Defendants, and award costs against Plaintiff, by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/12/2013.(ervsl, )
July 25, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 25 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Immunity Determinations. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/25/13.(bnbcd, )
August 19, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Defendants Renewed Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Immunity Determinations. Discovery and pretrial disclosures are STAYED pending further order of the court; and The plaintiff shall file a status report wit hin ten days after any ruling on the Renewed Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Doc. # 30 notifying me of the nature of the ruling and addressing the pretrial matters, if any, which should be scheduled, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/19/2013.(ervsl, )
November 18, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Defendants Renewed Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Defendants Motion is GRANTED with respect to the Board of Commissioners, and all claims against the Board are DISMISSED with prejudice; D efendants Motion is DENIED with respect to Defendant Bressler; and The stay of discovery and pretrial disclosures is hereby LIFTED, and Plaintiff shall file a status report on or before November 28, 2013 in accordance with the 34 August 19, 2013 Order of Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/18/2013.(ervsl, )
August 28, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Defendants Early Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Dave Bressler in his official capacity are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and This action remains pending against Defendant in his individual capacity, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/28/2014.(evana, )
September 15, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/15/14 re: Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending Immunity Determination 55 . The Motion is GRANTED, and all matters are stayed pending a ruling on defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 54 . (bsimm, )
December 6, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/6/2012. (ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxfield, v. Bressler, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert E. Maxfield
Represented By: Jeremy Allen Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weld County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Bressler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave (I) Bressler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]