Lee v. Shinseki

Plaintiff: Katie V. Lee
Defendant: Eric K. Shinseki
Case Number: 1:2012cv03005
Filed: November 15, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF Status Conference set for 2/11/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/9/2013. (mjwcd)
March 5, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 24 Aggrieved Motion for Relief by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/5/13.(dkals, )
April 10, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 35 plaintiff's Motion that Colorado Returns Computer, Phone, Camera, Household Documents Confiscated on April 4, 2013, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/10/2013.(mjwcd)
July 26, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 43 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay this Case. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/26/2013.(mjwcd)
November 20, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/20/12. (nmmsl, )
April 29, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming 67 Report and Recommendations. 55 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. All pending motions are terminated. Final Pretrial Conference is vacated. This case is dismissed in its entirety. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/29/2014. (athom, )
April 29, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT re: 68 Order. Signed by the Deputy Clerk on 4/29/2014. Text Only Entry (shart)
December 27, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/27/2012. (sks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Shinseki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie V. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric K. Shinseki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]