Rubano v. Draeger Medical, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kathleen Ann Rubano
Defendant: Draeger Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv03021
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/30/13.(mnfsl, )
January 30, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/30/13. (mnfsl, )
February 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 2/7/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 2/24/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/4/13. (rebsec, )
March 11, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 25 the Joint Motion to Vacate Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The Early Neutral Evaluation Conference set for 3/15/2013 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/11/2013. (mehcd)
April 10, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal granting 33 Stipulated Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set 2/7/2014, are VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 2/24/2014, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/10/2013.(klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubano v. Draeger Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Ann Rubano
Represented By: Seth J. Benezra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Draeger Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.