Medved et al v. DeAtley et al

Plaintiff: John F. Medved, Debra Medved and Medved Chevrolet, Inc.
Defendant: Richard Davis, Alan DeAtley, Leslie A. Powers and Powers & Therrien, P.S.
Case Number: 1:2012cv03034
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 85 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants are hereby granted leave to re-file a motion for attorney's fees within 14 days of the entry of judgment. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/13/13.(mnfsl, )
September 9, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Mr. Powers' Motion to Certify Court's Order of Dismissal as Final Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) [Docket No. 101] is DENIED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/09/14.(jhawk, )
September 9, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that this case shall be administratively closed, subject to reopening for good cause, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/09/14. (jhawk, )
May 24, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 53 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Disputed Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/24/2013. (mehcd)
July 2, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court grants in part and denies in part without prejudice 61 Defendant DeAtley's Motion for Stay or for a Protective Order Staying Discovery Against Him. This matter is hereby stayed until 9/4/2013 or pending further order of th e Court. A Status Conference is set for 9/4/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Plaintiffs' subpoena duces tecum issued to Barbara Brohl of the Colorado Department of Revenue is quashed without pre judice to its re-issuance upon the Court'slift of the stay of proceedings. Also, 56 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Entry of a Disputed Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information, the 59 Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpo ena Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(c)(3)(A), 75 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel [the Powers Defendants] to Respond in Full to Plaintiff John Medved's First Set of Written Discovery, and 76 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Alan D eAtley to Respond in Full to Plaintiff John Medved's First Set of Written Discovery are dismissed without prejudice to their re-filing, if necessary, upon the Court's lift of the stay of proceedings. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/2/13.(mnfsl, )
September 11, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 19 Motion to Dismiss (Leslie A. Powers and Powers & Therrien, P.S.) is granted. Plaintiffs' 29 Conditional Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is denied. Plaintiffs' sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, tenth, and eleventh clai ms against defendants Leslie A. Powers and Powers & Therrien, P.S. are dismissed. Defendants Leslie A. Powers and Powers & Therrien, P.S. are dismissed from this case. Within 14 days of this Order, Leslie A. Powers and Powers & Therrien, P.S. may file their bill of costs with the Clerk of the Court. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/11/13.(mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medved et al v. DeAtley et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Medved
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Medved
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medved Chevrolet, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan DeAtley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie A. Powers
Represented By: Michael Robert McCormick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powers & Therrien, P.S.
Represented By: Michael Robert McCormick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]